ND HB1434 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employees retirement system uniform group insurance coverage of autism services; to require a report regarding coverage of autism services; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Public employees retirement system uniform group insurance coverage of autism services; to require a report regarding coverage of autism services; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 61 nays 29 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 43 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 16 4 1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 3 |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |