ND HB1432 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 24-05-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to purchasing road machinery.
Title
Purchasing road machinery.
Sponsors
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Donald Longmuir [R] |
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2019-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |