ND HB1386 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 14-02.4-01, 14-02.4-02, 14-02.4-03, 14-02.4-04, 14-02.4-05, 14-02.4-06, 14-02.4-08, and 14-02.4-09, subsection 1 of section 14-02.4-14, sections 14-02.4-15, 14-02.4-16, and 14-02.4-17, subsections 1 and 2 of section 14-02.5-02, sections 14-02.5-03, 14-02.5-04, 14-02.5-05, 14-02.5-07, and 14-02.5-08, subsection 3 of section 14-02.5-10, subsection 11 of section 26.1-04-03, subsection 1 of section 26.1-30.1-01.1, subsection 1 of section 26.1-39-17, subsection 1 of section 26.1-40-11, and sections 26.1-47-04 and 27-09.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.
Title
Prohibition of discrimination on the basis of sexual orientation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 69 |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |