ND 1314 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 54 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cybersecurity incident reporting requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cybersecurity incident reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseSigned by Governor 03/23
2021-03-19HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-12SenateSigned by President
2021-03-11HouseReturned to House
2021-03-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-09SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-19SenateReceived from House
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2021-02-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback