ND HB1273 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-10-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the state auditor.
Title
The powers and duties of the state auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 91 |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |