ND 1256 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact five new sections to chapter 43-20 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to regulation of dental therapists; to amend and reenact sections 43-20-01.1, 43-20-01.3, 43-20-01.4, 43-20-02.1, 43-20-05, 43-20-06, 43-20-08, 43-20-10, 43-20-11, 43-20-12.2, 43-28-03, 43-28-04, and 43-28-06 and subsection 9 of section 43-28-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of dental therapists; to provide for reports; and to provide for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The regulation of dental therapists; to provide for reports; and to provide for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 59
2017-02-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
2017-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback