ND 1190 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying concealed weapons at public gatherings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carrying concealed weapons at public gatherings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
2017-03-21SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 5
2017-02-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2017-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback