ND 1164 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-03-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the review of presidential executive orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The review of presidential executive orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseSigned by Governor 04/23
2021-04-22HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-20SenateSigned by President
2021-04-19SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7
2021-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12
2021-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-16HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Myrdal Luick Dwyer
2021-04-01HouseConference committee appointed Satrom Vetter Hanson
2021-04-01HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-29HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 36 nays 9
2021-03-25SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-12SenateReceived from House
2021-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13
2021-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1164.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-03001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0492-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-26.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-53.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-68.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback