ND HB1097 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-30-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Sunday closing laws and retail agreements; to repeal sections 12.1-30-01, 12.1-30-02, and 12.1-30-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Sunday closing laws; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Sunday closing laws; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2019-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 21 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 35 |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |