NC S943 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-27 - Ch. SL 2009-529
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-27 - Ch. SL 2009-529
Summary
Expand Film Credit.
Title
Expand Film Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | Ch. SL 2009-529 | |
2009-08-27 | Signed By Gov. 8/27/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-22 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-29 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-06-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Amend Failed #1 | |
2009-06-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H977 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S943 |