NC S93 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting NC Families in Crisis
Title
Assisting NC Families in Crisis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Child Custody
Courts
Dhhs
Family Issues
Foster Care
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Medicaid
Mental Health
Minors
Poverty
Public
Public Health
Session Laws
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Courts
Dhhs
Family Issues
Foster Care
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Medicaid
Mental Health
Minors
Poverty
Public
Public Health
Session Laws
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
108A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
108A | 54.3A | (n/a) | Citation Text |