NC S905 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Currituck CAMA Setback Req'ts./Grandfather
Title
Currituck CAMA Setback Req'ts./Grandfather
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-07-03 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-25 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-12 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-30 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2012-05-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-29 | Filed |