NC S90 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Religious Meeting Places
Title
Protect Religious Meeting Places
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Sen. Eddie Gallimore [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Paul Newton [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H110 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S90 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S90v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S90v1.pdf |