NC H110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Religious Meeting Places
Title
Protect Religious Meeting Places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S90 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate