NC S892 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Ch. Res 2016-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Ch. Res 2016-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor John H. Kerr, III, Former Member
Title
Honor John H. Kerr, III, Former Member
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Ch. Res 2016-11 | |
2016-06-09 | Ratified | |
2016-06-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-08 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Filed |