NC S886 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources
Summary
Improve Success of FMPs.
Title
Improve Success of FMPs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Marine Resources and Aquaculture, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1346 (Same As) 2009-04-09 - Ref To Com On Marine Resources and Aquaculture
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S886 |