NC S851 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-452
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Supervision of Certain Defendants
Title
Supervision of Certain Defendants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-29 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ch. SL 2009-452 | |
2009-08-07 | Signed By Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Ratified | |
2009-07-29 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-22 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1076 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources