NC H1076 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources
Pending: House Wildlife Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Bladen Fox Hunting
Title
Bladen Fox Hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Blackwood [R] | Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Margaret Jeffus [D] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Laura Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-06-21 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-16 | Engrossed | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-23 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-06 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S851 (Same As) 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-452