NC S85 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Vision Service Plans
Title
Allow Vision Service Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Ch. SL 2021-169 | |
2021-10-15 | Signed by Gov. 10/15/2021 | |
2021-10-08 | Pres. To Gov. 10/8/2021 | |
2021-10-07 | Ratified | |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S85v3 |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/06/2021 |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend |
2021-09-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2021 |
2021-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-08-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-30 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Corporations
Council Of State
Dentists & Dentistry
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Nonprofit
Opticians & Optometrists
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Title Change
Corporations
Council Of State
Dentists & Dentistry
Health
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Nonprofit
Opticians & Optometrists
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 38-35 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 49-25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 50-45 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 50-5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-1.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-110 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-120 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-131 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-132 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-150 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-155 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-165 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-166 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-50 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-60 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 65-95 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 66-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 66-35 | (n/a) | Citation Text |