NC S836 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DOT Minority/Women Business Program
Title
DOT Minority/Women Business Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1124 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations