NC S815 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Ch. SL 2014-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Ch. SL 2014-50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ensuring Privacy of Student Records
Title
Ensuring Privacy of Student Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Ch. SL 2014-50 | |
2014-07-01 | Signed by Gov. 7/1/2014 | |
2014-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 06/26/2014 | |
2014-06-25 | Ratified | |
2014-06-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2014 |
2014-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-06-18 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-17 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Filed |