NC S803 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rev Laws Technical, Clarifying, & Admin. Chg
Title
Rev Laws Technical, Clarifying, & Admin. Chg
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Ch. SL 2016-92 | |
2016-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-07-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-07-01 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-23 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1023 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - Ch. SL 2016-8