NC S8 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
In-State Tuition Pilot Program
Title
In-State Tuition Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H81 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Boards
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Board
Education
Higher Education
Pilot Programs
Public
Reports
Tuition
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Board
Education
Higher Education
Pilot Programs
Public
Reports
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | 39 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 143.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S8 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S8v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S8v1.pdf |