NC S799 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ch. SL 2012-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Ch. SL 2012-21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repair Guilford Local Act
Title
Repair Guilford Local Act
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Berger [R] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Gladys Robinson [D] | Sen. Robert Rucho [R] |
Sen. Donald Vaughan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Ch. SL 2012-21 | |
2012-06-12 | Ratified | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Postponed To 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-05-16 | Placed On Cal For 5/16/2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-16 | Ref To Com On Redistricting | |
2012-05-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |