NC S772 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Ch. SL 2024-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Ch. SL 2024-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Comm. Coll. Trustee Terms/Region 3
Title
Comm. Coll. Trustee Terms/Region 3
Sponsors
Sen. Benton Sawrey [R] | Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Ch. SL 2024-5 | |
2024-06-06 | Ratified | |
2024-06-05 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-06-05 | House | Added to Calendar |
2024-06-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2024-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2024-05-15 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2024-05-07 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2024-05-07 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Bladen County
Boards
Chaptered
Chatham County
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Counties
County Commissioners
Duplin County
Greene County
Harnett County
Hoke County
Johnston County
Lenoir County
Local
Local Government
Membership
Pender County
Pitt County
Ratified
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Bladen County
Boards
Chaptered
Chatham County
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Counties
County Commissioners
Duplin County
Greene County
Harnett County
Hoke County
Johnston County
Lenoir County
Local
Local Government
Membership
Pender County
Pitt County
Ratified
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115D | 13 | (n/a) | Citation Text |