NC S764 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-348
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-348
Summary
Real Estate/Settlement Agent Embezzlement.
Title
Real Estate/Settlement Agent Embezzlement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Ch. SL 2009-348 | |
2009-07-27 | Signed By Gov. 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Ratified | |
2009-07-16 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/16/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2009 | |
2009-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-17 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-23 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S764 |