NC S763 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue Laws Tech. Changes and Other Changes
Title
Revenue Laws Tech. Changes and Other Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A6 Moore, T. Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A5 Cleveland Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A4 Iler Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-08-01 - House - A4 Iler M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A3 Hager Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A6 Moore, T. Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A5 Cleveland Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A4 Iler Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 69 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-08-01 - House - A4 Iler M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-01 - House - A3 Hager Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-08-02 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-08-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-08-01 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-08-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-08-01 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2014-08-01 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-08-01 | House | Amend Failed A4 |
2014-08-01 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-07-31 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A2 |
2014-07-31 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-07-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-24 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-07-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-24 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Filed |