NC S760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Eddie Buffaloe/Secretary of DPS
Title
Confirm Eddie Buffaloe/Secretary of DPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Confirmation
Emergency Services
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Resolutions
Simple
Confirmation
Emergency Services
General Assembly
Governor
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Resolutions
Simple