NC S750 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Ch. SL 2020-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Capital Projects-Elizabeth City State Univ

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Projects-Elizabeth City State Univ

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Ch. SL 2020-57
2020-06-30 Signed by Gov. 6/30/2020
2020-06-25 Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
2020-06-25 Ratified
2020-06-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-24SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2020-06-24SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-19SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-18HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-18HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-18HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/18/2020
2020-06-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-17HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2020-06-16HousePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2020
2020-06-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-16HouseReptd Fav
2020-06-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-16HouseReptd Fav
2020-06-11HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-11HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2020-06-11SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-11SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-09SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-05-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback