NC S741 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
State Controller/Criminal Record Checks
Title
State Controller/Criminal Record Checks
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H970 (Same As) 2016-06-22 - Ch. SL 2016-28