NC S740 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Sequential Referral To Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Sequential Referral To Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DPS Study Commercial Vehicle Safety Alliance
Title
DPS Study Commercial Vehicle Safety Alliance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Added |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1190 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Ref To Com On Transportation