NC S726 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Ch. Res 2021-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Ch. Res 2021-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Dave Richard/Director Health Benefits
Title
Confirm Dave Richard/Director Health Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ch. Res 2021-7 |
2021-06-30 | Ratified | |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Chaptered
Confirmation
Dhhs
General Assembly
Governor
Health Services
Joint
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions
Chaptered
Confirmation
Dhhs
General Assembly
Governor
Health Services
Joint
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions