NC S706 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Technical and Other Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical and Other Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-07-08SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-07-08HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-07-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-07-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-07-08HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-07-08HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-22HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2020-06-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2020-06-19SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-04SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-05-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-05-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2020-04-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1047 (Same As) 2020-04-29 - Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback