NC S706 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-20 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-20 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Summary
Amend On-Site Wastewater Contractor Laws.
Title
Amend On-Site Wastewater Contractor Laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-04-20 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H685 (Same As) 2011-05-31 - Re-ref Com On Government
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S706 |