NC S7 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Ch. SL 2011-12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Add Controlled Substances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add Controlled Substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-15 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25 Ch. SL 2011-12
2011-03-25 Signed By Gov. 3/25/2011
2011-03-17 Pres. To Gov. 3/17/2011
2011-03-16 Ratified
2011-03-15 Concurred In H/com Sub
2011-03-14 Placed On Cal For 3/15/2011
2011-03-11 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2011-03-10 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2011-03-09 Placed On Cal For 3/10/2011
2011-03-09 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2011-03-09 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2011-02-23 Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B
2011-02-23 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2011-02-15 Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B
2011-02-15 Passed 1st Reading
2011-02-10 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2011-02-08 Placed On Cal For 2/10/2011
2011-02-08 Withdrawn From Cal
2011-02-07 Reptd Fav
2011-01-31 Ref To Com On Judiciary II
2011-01-31 Passed 1st Reading
2011-01-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H13 (Same As) 2011-01-31 - Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Appropriations

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2011&BillID=S7&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/Senate/HTML/S7v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=S&RCS=16
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=102
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=S&RCS=77

Bill Comments

feedback