NC S686 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I
Summary
Electronic Reporting of Abandoned Property.
Title
Electronic Reporting of Abandoned Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] |
Sen. Tony Foriest [D] | Sen. James Forrester [R] | Sen. David Rouzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S686 |