NC S673 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Ch. SL 2023-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-23 - Ch. SL 2023-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater Regulatory Relief Act
Title
Wastewater Regulatory Relief Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-23 | Ch. SL 2023-55 | |
2023-06-23 | Signed by Gov. 6/23/2023 | |
2023-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2023 | |
2023-06-15 | Ratified | |
2023-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-05 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Deq
Environment
Infrastructure
Lakes & Rivers
Pollution
Presented
Public
Ratified
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Deq
Environment
Infrastructure
Lakes & Rivers
Pollution
Presented
Public
Ratified
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 215.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162A | 201 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162A | 205 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
162A | 211 | (n/a) | Citation Text |