NC S654 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

K-12 COVID-19 Provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 COVID-19 Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - A2 Smith, K. Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - A3 von Haefen Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 74 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-06-14SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-06-14SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2021-06-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/14/2021
2021-06-10SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-09HouseAmend Failed A3
2021-06-09HouseAmend Failed A2
2021-06-09HouseAmend Failed A1
2021-06-09HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-09HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-09HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-09HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-09HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-05HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-05SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-04SenateEngrossed
2021-05-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-04-29SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/04/2021
2021-04-29SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-13SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-06SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S654
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S654v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50827/0/S654-PCS15280-TC-30
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51165/0/S654-ATC-67-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52060/0/S654-PCS45432-BEa-26
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52090/0/S654-PCS35295-BEa-30
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52094/0/S654-AMK-26-V-6
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52095/0/S654-AMK-27-V-5
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52096/0/S654-ABE-33-V-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S654-SMTC-72(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S654-SMBE-69(CSBEa-26)-v-10
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S654-SMBE-71(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S654-SMBE-72(e5)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S654-SMBE-72(e5)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/134
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/133
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/389
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/388
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/387
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/270

Bill Comments 750

feedback