NC S64 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-492
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-492
Summary
Motorcycle Learner's Permit.
Title
Motorcycle Learner's Permit.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-492 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Ratified | |
2009-08-04 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-30 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-28 | Postponed To 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 7/28/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-03-11 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-03-10 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S64 |