NC S636 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Graduated Licensing Requirements
Title
Modify Graduated Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Senate - House Amd 1,2\Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A2 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 Daughtry\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A2 Insko\Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - A1 Daughtry\Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-385 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Filed |