NC S631 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-495
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-495
Summary
DMV Bureau of License and Theft/Vehicles.
Title
DMV Bureau of License and Theft/Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-495 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Serial referral to Finance is stricken. | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H929 (Same As) 2011-06-14 - Adopted
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S631 |