NC S605 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Various Changes to the Revenue Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Changes to the Revenue Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A3 Bumgardner Third Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A2 Stam Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - A1 Blackwell Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-09-29SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2015-09-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2015-09-28HouseOrdered Engrossed
2015-09-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-09-28HouseAmend Adopted A3
2015-09-28HouseAmend Adopted A2
2015-09-28HouseAmend Adopted A1
2015-09-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-09-23HousePlaced On Cal For 09/24/2015
2015-09-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-09-23HouseRuled Material
2015-09-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-09-22HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-09-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-09-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-09-03HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-07-28HouseRef To Com On Finance
2015-07-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-07-28HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2015-07-27SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-07-23 Engrossed
2015-07-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-07-22SenateAmend Adopted A2
2015-07-22SenateAmend Adopted A1
2015-07-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2015-07-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-04-09SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-04-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-03-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-03-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-03-26SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=S605&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S605v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=540
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=541
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=542
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=556
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1026
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1045
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1046
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1047
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1048

Bill Comments 750

feedback