NC S594 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-01 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus Justice Amendments
Title
Omnibus Justice Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - M12 Suspend Rules Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A9 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-30 - House - A8 Davis Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A7 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-30 - House - A6 Stam Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A5 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A4 Reives Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A3 Stam Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A2 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - House - A1 Boles Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 69 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-06-30 - House - M12 Suspend Rules Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A9 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-30 - House - A8 Davis Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A7 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-30 - House - A6 Stam Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - House - A5 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A4 Reives Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A3 Stam Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - A2 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-06-26 - House - A1 Boles Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal. (Y: 69 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-07-01 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-30 | House | Amend Failed A9 |
2014-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A8 |
2014-06-30 | House | Amend Failed A7 |
2014-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2014-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2014-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2014-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2014-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-24 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-22 | Engrossed | |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Motion to Table Amd 2 Failed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |