NC S581 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-318
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Motor Vehicle Laws
Title
Clarify Motor Vehicle Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-318 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-06 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-24 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-02 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-14 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Filed |