NC S580 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ref To Com On Environment
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ref To Com On Environment
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expedite Cleanup of Orphan Landfill Sites
Title
Expedite Cleanup of Orphan Landfill Sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |