NC S557 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Ch. SL 2019-246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Various Finance Law Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Finance Law Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-31 - House - Motion 12 / Appeal Ruling of Chair Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-10-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08 Ch. SL 2019-246
2019-11-08 Signed by Gov. 11/8/2019
2019-11-01 Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-31 Ratified
2019-10-31SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-31SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-10-31SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-10-31SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-10-31HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-30HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-30HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-10-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-10-30HouseRuled Material
2019-10-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-24HouseRef To Com On Finance
2019-10-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-10-24HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-10-24SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-10-24SenateEngrossed
2019-10-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-23SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-10-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-10-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-17SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H537 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-69

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S557
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S557v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/616
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/615
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/620
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/887
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/652
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/906
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/905

Bill Comments

feedback