NC S555 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-353
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Study Modernization of Banking Laws
Title
Study Modernization of Banking Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-353 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-09 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-12 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-04-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-11 | Filed |