NC S545 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Ch. SL 2015-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Ch. SL 2015-143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workforce Enrichment/Veterans
Title
Workforce Enrichment/Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Jackson [D] | Sen. William Cook [R] |
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Paul Lowe [D] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] |
Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Ch. SL 2015-143 | |
2015-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2015 | |
2015-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 07/01/2015 | |
2015-06-30 | Ratified | |
2015-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2015 |
2015-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2015-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Workforce and Economic Development. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |