NC S54 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Ch. Res 2021-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Ch. Res 2021-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Governor's Appts/Mining Commission
Title
Confirm Governor's Appts/Mining Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Ch. Res 2021-2 |
2021-02-17 | Ratified | |
2021-02-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/17/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-02-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-16 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Chaptered
Commissions
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Joint
Mining & Mineral Extraction
Mining Comn.
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions
Chaptered
Commissions
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Joint
Mining & Mineral Extraction
Mining Comn.
Public Officials
Ratified
Resolutions