NC S537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Ch. SL 2019-240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Licensing & HHS Amends & Rural Health Stable
Title
Licensing & HHS Amends & Rural Health Stable
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-08-05 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-08-05 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Ch. SL 2019-240 | |
2019-11-06 | Signed by Gov. 11/6/2019 | |
2019-11-01 | Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/31/2019 |
2019-10-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-08-21 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-08-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-08-05 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-08-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-08-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-05 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-08-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/05/2019 |
2019-07-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-31 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-07-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House